Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/23/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/23/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/23/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/23/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 08/03/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/10/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/10/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/17/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/05/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/27/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2002