Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/04/2002 Became Public Law No: 107-323.
12/04/2002 Signed by President.
11/22/2002 Presented to President.
11/15/2002 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR 11/14/2002 H8911-8912)
11/15/2002 Committee on Resources discharged.
10/02/2002 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text as passed Senate: CR S9858-9859)
10/02/2002 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9858-9859)
07/24/2001 Introduced in Senate