Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/25/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/26/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/31/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/31/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/31/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 08/01/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/03/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/04/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/05/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/05/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/21/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/15/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/23/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/29/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/03/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/04/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/26/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/01/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/03/2002