There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Product Packaging Protection Act of 2002

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Product Packaging Protection Act of 2001

Short Titles as Introduced

Product Packaging Protection Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide penalties for certain unauthorized writing with respect to consumer products.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/16/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2001By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 107-106.
09/06/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/24/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/17/2002-11:23amHouseHeld at the desk.
10/17/2002-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
10/17/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/16/2002SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/16/2002SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
10/16/2002SenateS.Amdt.4889 Amendment SA 4889 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/16/2002SenateS.Amdt.4889 Amendment SA 4889 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Kohl. (consideration: CR S10594; text: CR S10594) To provide a substitute.
10/16/2002SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10594; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S10594)
12/04/2001SenateBy Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 107-106.
09/06/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 152.
09/06/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/06/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/01/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Competition and Business and Consumer Rights. Hearings held Subcommittee changed to Antitrust, Business Rights and Competition. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 107-528.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Competition and Business and Consumer Rights
07/24/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8136)
07/24/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8135-8136)

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/24/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/24/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/24/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 07/24/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/24/2001 Referred to
09/06/2001 Markup by
09/06/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-106
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Competition and Business and Consumer Rights08/01/2001 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1233. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/16/2002)

Product Packaging Protection Act of 2002 - Amends Federal criminal law to impose criminal penalties, including imprisonment for up to one year, for tampering with a consumer product sold in interstate or foreign commerce by knowingly placing, before sale, any writing in the product or in its container without the consent of the manufacturer, retailer, or distributor.

Increases the imprisonment penalty from one year to three years for a repeat offender.

Defines "writing" as any form of representation or communication, including handbills, notices, or advertising, that contain letters, words, or pictorial representations.