Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/27/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/27/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/27/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/04/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/04/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/21/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/16/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 12/03/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/13/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/14/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/15/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/15/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/09/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/09/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/17/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/25/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/08/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/08/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/23/2002