Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 01/23/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/25/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/29/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/29/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/01/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/01/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/02/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/05/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/02/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/02/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/03/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/19/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/16/2001