Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/30/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/30/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 08/01/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/02/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 08/02/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/04/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/14/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 11/14/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/14/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/14/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 11/16/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/27/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/07/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/07/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 05/22/2002