Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/02/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/05/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/24/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/09/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 12/06/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 12/11/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/04/2002