Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 07/31/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/03/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/05/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/10/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/01/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/28/2001