Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/20/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/16/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/16/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/16/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/16/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/16/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/16/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/16/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/16/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/30/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/30/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/03/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/03/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/17/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/17/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/16/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/17/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/12/2002