Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/04/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/08/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/07/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/25/2002