Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/03/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/09/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/08/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/08/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/09/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/23/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/15/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/17/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/21/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/21/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/21/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/21/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/22/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/04/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/04/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/04/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/04/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/05/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/05/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/11/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/12/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/12/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/14/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/14/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/19/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/19/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/20/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/24/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/24/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/24/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/24/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/27/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/28/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/08/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/08/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/22/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/23/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/03/2002