Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 08/02/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/13/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/19/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/19/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/20/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/20/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/09/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/09/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/11/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/25/2002