Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/11/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/18/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/29/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/01/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/09/2002