Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/04/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/10/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/13/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/26/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/09/2001