There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to extend the deadline for aliens to present a border crossing card that contains a biometric identifier matching the appropriate biometric characteristic of the alien.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text as passed Senate: CR S14082)
12/20/2001Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14082)
09/04/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
03/18/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/23/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/23/2002-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S14082)
12/20/2001SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14082)
09/04/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 09/04/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/10/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/24/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/26/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/09/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary09/04/2001 Referred to
12/20/2001 Discharged from
House Judiciary01/23/2002 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims03/18/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1400. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/20/2001)

Amends the Illegal Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to extend the deadline (one additional year) requiring aliens to present a border crossing identification card that contains a biometric identifier.