Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/15/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/08/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/08/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/08/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/08/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/09/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/09/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/11/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/16/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/24/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/25/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/01/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/02/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/13/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/17/2002