Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/06/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/12/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/12/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/13/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/14/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/19/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/19/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/21/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/25/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/25/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/25/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/25/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/25/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/25/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/25/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/25/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/09/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/09/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/07/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/13/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/28/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/12/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 02/12/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/14/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/14/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/22/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/08/2002