Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 09/19/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/20/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/21/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/21/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/24/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/25/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/25/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/25/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/26/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 10/01/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/03/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/03/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/03/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/04/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/09/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/09/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/09/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/10/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 10/10/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/10/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/11/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/15/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/15/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/15/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/01/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/06/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/06/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/06/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/06/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/15/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/15/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 11/15/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/15/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/15/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/15/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/15/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 11/15/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/27/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/04/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/04/2002