Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 09/21/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/24/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/24/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/24/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/24/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/25/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/25/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/25/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/26/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/26/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/26/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/26/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/01/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/01/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/01/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 10/01/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/01/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/01/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/01/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/01/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/01/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/02/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/02/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/03/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/03/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/09/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/09/2001