Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/04/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/09/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/24/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/28/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/03/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/12/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/04/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/06/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/26/2002