Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/04/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/09/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/09/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/10/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/14/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/15/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/06/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/12/2001