Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/07/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/25/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/05/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/07/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/16/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/08/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/22/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/10/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/26/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/29/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/17/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/18/2002