Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 10/16/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/18/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/18/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/18/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/30/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/07/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/13/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/13/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/30/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/07/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/24/2002