Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/25/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/25/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/25/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/25/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/31/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/07/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/09/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/13/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/13/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/13/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/03/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 12/03/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/05/2001