There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a program to provide grants to drinking water and wastewater facilities to meet immediate security needs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14061-14062; text as passed Senate: CR S14061-14062)
12/10/2001Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Jeffords with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-119.
10/31/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/23/2002-4:48pmHouseHeld at the desk.
01/23/2002-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14061-14062; text as passed Senate: CR S14061-14062)
12/10/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 273.
12/10/2001SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Jeffords with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-119.
11/08/2001SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/31/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S11291)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 10/31/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/31/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/31/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works10/31/2001 Referred to
11/08/2001 Markup by
12/10/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-119

No related bill information was received for S.1608.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1608. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/10/2001)

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to establish a program to allocate funds to States for use in awarding grants to publicly- or privately-owned drinking water or wastewater facilities for projects or activities carried out to address an immediate physical security need.

Authorizes appropriations.