Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/03/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/27/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/14/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/15/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/19/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/08/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/16/2002