Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 11/01/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/09/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/16/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/27/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 12/04/2001