There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Extended Unemployment Compensation bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the period of availability of unemployment assistance under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act in the case of victims of the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
03/18/2002Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-377.
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13893; text as passed Senate: CR S13893)
12/10/2001Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Jeffords without amendment. With written report No. 107-120.
11/01/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/18/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
03/18/2002HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-377.
02/27/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/23/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/23/2002-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13893; text as passed Senate: CR S13893)
12/10/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 274.
12/10/2001SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Jeffords without amendment. With written report No. 107-120.
11/08/2001SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/01/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/01/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works11/01/2001 Referred to
11/08/2001 Markup by
12/10/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-120
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/23/2002 Referred to
03/18/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-377

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1622. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (12/10/2001)

Directs the President to make unemployment assistance available to individuals eligible under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act as a result of the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, for 52 weeks after the major disaster is declared.