Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/01/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/19/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/22/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/22/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/02/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/02/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/10/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/10/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/05/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/17/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 08/01/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/25/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/25/2002