There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to waive certain limitations in the case of use of the emergency fund authorized by section 125 of title 23, United States Code, to pay the costs of projects in response to the attack on the World Trade Center in New York City that occurred on September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 1/23/2002 S47)
12/10/2001Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Jeffords without amendment. With written report No. 107-121.
11/06/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/24/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/23/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/23/2002-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 1/23/2002 S47)
12/20/2001SenateS.Amdt.2696 Amendment SA 2696 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2001SenateS.Amdt.2696 Amendment SA 2696 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Clinton. (consideration: CR S14062; text: CR S14062) To make certain modifications to the bill.
12/20/2001SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S14062)
12/10/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
12/10/2001SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Jeffords without amendment. With written report No. 107-121.
11/08/2001SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/06/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/06/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works11/06/2001 Referred to
11/08/2001 Markup by
12/10/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-121
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/23/2002 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit01/24/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1637. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/20/2001)

Provides that with respect to the use of the emergency fund authorized under Federal highway provisions to pay the costs of projects in response to the attack on the World Trade Center in New York City on September 11, 2001, notwithstanding otherwise applicable limitations: (1) the Federal cost share of each such project shall be 100 percent; and (2) the Secretary of Transportation may obligate more than $100 million for those projects.