Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 01/25/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/29/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 01/29/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/04/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/14/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/28/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/11/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/2002