Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/25/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/29/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/04/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/04/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/14/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/04/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/04/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/21/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/16/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/01/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/01/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/02/2002