Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/25/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 01/25/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/29/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/29/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 01/29/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/04/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/04/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/04/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/14/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/14/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/28/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/04/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/11/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/21/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/16/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/01/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/01/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/02/2002