There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States Consensus Council Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Consensus Council Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the United States Consensus Council to provide for a consensus building process in addressing national public policy issues, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/04/2002By Senator Lieberman from Committee on Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/17/2002. Report No. 107-330.
10/15/2002Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/07/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
11/04/2002By Senator Lieberman from Committee on Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/17/2002. Report No. 107-330.
Action By: Senate
10/15/2002Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 709.
Action By: Senate
10/15/2002Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/09/2002Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/07/2001Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S11559-11561)
Action By: Senate
01/07/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S11559)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs11/07/2001 Referred to
10/09/2002 Markup by
10/15/2002 Reported by S. Rept. 107-330

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1651. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (10/15/2002)

United States Consensus Council Act of 2002 - (Sec. 4) Establishes the United States Consensus Council as an independent nonprofit corporation under the District of Columbia Nonprofit Corporation Act.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes the Council to: (1) develop and conduct processes to build consensus on national policy issues; (2) identify particular public policy issues as to which the Council's expertise would be useful in building a consensus; (3) develop and apply criteria for determining whether the Council will enter into a consensus-building process on a particular issue; and (4) coordinate with, make referrals to, and receive referrals from other U.S. consensus building instrumentalities, including the U.S. Institute for Environmental Conflict Resolution and the Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service. Prohibits the Council from taking any action relating to a matter within the authority of the Institute or the Service without their consent.

Allows the Council, for each consensus building process, to: (1) consider congressional interest, issue complexity, cost, ripeness, likelihood of participation by key stakeholders, and other relevant indices in determining whether to enter into a particular consensus process; (2) identify any appropriate facilitator and key stakeholders; (3) publish a common set of facts to inform and assist consensus-building processes; (4) establish ground rules related to confidentiality, representation of counsel, and ex parte communications; (5) work to promote consensus by methods of dispute resolution; (6) build agreements among stakeholders; (7) report the results of consensus-building efforts; and (8) provide issue training and technical assistance.

Directs the Council to develop guidelines on its operating policies and duties, including for the establishment of advisory bodies.

(Sec. 6) Vests the powers of the Council in a Board of Directors. Prohibits any Director from being a Federal officer or employee, including a Member of Congress.

(Sec. 7) Provides for appointment by the Board of a President who shall be the chief executive officer of the Council and subject to the supervision of the Board.

(Sec. 8) Directs the Council to monitor and evaluate programs to ensure compliance with this Act.

Requires annual audits of the Council's accounts and an annual financial report to the President, Congress, and the General Accounting Office on the Council's activities, the audit report, and funds received.

(Sec. 9) Authorizes appropriations.