There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Homeowners Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide that a member of the uniformed services or the Foreign Service shall be treated as using a principal residence while away from home on qualified official extended duty in determining the exclusion of gain from the sale of such residence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/13/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
11/13/2001Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S11723)
Action By: Senate
11/13/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S11722-11723)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 11/13/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/29/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/29/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/29/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/29/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/29/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/29/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/29/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/29/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/29/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/29/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/29/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/29/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/29/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 11/29/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/29/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/03/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 12/04/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/05/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 12/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/06/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/24/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/05/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/23/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/03/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/14/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/11/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/15/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/13/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/17/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance11/13/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1678.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1678. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/13/2001)

Military Homeowners Equity Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to state that members of the Uniformed or Foreign Services on qualified official extended duty shall be considered to be using already owned and used property as a principal residence for purposes of determining exclusion of gain upon such residence's sale.