Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 11/13/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 11/13/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/29/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/29/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/29/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/29/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/29/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/29/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/29/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/29/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/29/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/29/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/29/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/29/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/29/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 11/29/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/29/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/03/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 12/04/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/05/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 12/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/06/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/24/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/05/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/23/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/03/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/14/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/11/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/15/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/13/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/17/2002