Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/24/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/08/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/13/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/13/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/13/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/26/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/26/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/26/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/27/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/08/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/08/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/12/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/15/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/15/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/19/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/19/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/21/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/21/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/22/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/26/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/26/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/27/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/28/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/28/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/29/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/29/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/29/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/30/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/02/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/04/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/04/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/04/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/04/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/05/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/05/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/06/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/23/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/23/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/23/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/24/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/26/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/01/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/02/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/03/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/09/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/15/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/15/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/21/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/24/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/24/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/25/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/07/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/08/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/13/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/13/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/19/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/20/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/29/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/11/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/31/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/02/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/04/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/11/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/04/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/12/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/14/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/18/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/21/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/16/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/05/2002