Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/16/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 11/16/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/16/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/27/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/27/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/27/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 11/27/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/28/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/29/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/29/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/29/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/29/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 11/29/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/30/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/30/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/30/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/03/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 12/03/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 12/03/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 12/03/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 12/04/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/05/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/05/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 12/05/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 12/05/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/05/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/06/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/07/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/07/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/07/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 12/07/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/10/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 12/10/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 12/11/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 12/11/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 12/11/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/11/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/12/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/13/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 12/14/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/14/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/14/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/17/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 12/17/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/18/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 12/18/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/18/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/19/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/19/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/20/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/24/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 01/25/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/29/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/04/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/13/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/13/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/11/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/18/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/19/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/21/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/08/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/09/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/20/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/11/2002