Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 11/15/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 12/18/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/05/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/05/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/26/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/05/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/20/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/04/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/21/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/17/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/30/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/30/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/16/2002