Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 11/29/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/30/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/30/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 12/03/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 12/03/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/04/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/04/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 12/04/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 12/04/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/04/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/05/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/06/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/07/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/10/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 12/13/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/13/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 12/20/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/08/2002