There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Biological Chemical Attack bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Bioterrorism Preparedness Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the ability of the United States to prepare for and respond to a biological threat or attack.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/04/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
12/05/2001Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2001Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 12/04/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/05/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/05/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/05/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/07/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/07/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 12/18/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 12/18/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/12/2002

Committees (0)

As of 07/22/2018 text has not been received for S.1765 - Bioterrorism Preparedness Act of 2001

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (146)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1765. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/04/2001)

Bioterrorism Preparedness Act of 2001 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to add provisions granting additional authorities to the Secretary of Health and Human Services concerning bioterrorism preparedness and responding to public health emergencies. Requires the Secretary to develop and implement a plan which includes the development of specific criteria enabling measurements to be made of the progress made at the national, State, and local levels toward achieving the national goal of bioterrorism preparedness.

Requires the maintenance of an adequate national pharmaceutical stockpile of vaccines (including a smallpox vaccine), therapies, and medical supplies for use at the Secretary's discretion in the event of a biological threat or attack or other public health emergency.

Expands the role of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Directs the Secretary to provide for the establishment of a coordinated network of public health laboratories to assist with the detection of and response to a biological threat or attack.

Provides for the appointment of an Assistant Secretary for Emergency Preparedness who shall head the Office for Emergency Preparedness.

Provides for a National Disaster Medical System to provide appropriate health and social services to respond to a public health emergency, if the Secretary activates the System.

Provides for enhanced regulatory control of biological agents and toxins.

Establishes a State Bioterrorism Preparedness and Response Block Grant Program to improve State and local preparedness and response capabilities.

Amends the Clayton Act to provide for a limited antitrust exemption with respect to the development of new countermeasures against bioterrorism.

Requires, under the Public Health Service Act, the development of a crisis communications and education strategy with respect to bioterrorist threats to the food supply. Expands animal and plant health inspection service activities and authorities.

Amends the Federal Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act to expand the authority of the Food and Drug Administration with respect to food presenting a serious threat to humans or animals.

Requires the registration of food manufacturing, processing, and handling facilities.

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to utilize existing authorities to expand Agricultural Research Service and Cooperative State Research Education and Extension Service programs to protect the food supply of the United States.