Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 12/04/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 12/04/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/05/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/05/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/05/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/07/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/07/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 12/18/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 12/18/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/12/2002