Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/25/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/29/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/29/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 01/29/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/01/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/27/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/27/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/28/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/28/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/05/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/08/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/22/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/26/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/26/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/27/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/29/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/02/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/05/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/23/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/24/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/30/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/10/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/13/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/17/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 08/02/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/04/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/26/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/04/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/14/2002