There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Nurse Reinvestment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Nurse Reinvestment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a Nurse Corps and recruitment and retention strategies to address the nursing shortage, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14065)
12/20/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/04/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/23/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/23/2002-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14065)
12/20/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S13946-13947)

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/15/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/09/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/10/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/23/2002 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/04/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/20/2001)

Nurse Reinvestment Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to permit the service required by the Nursing Workforce Development Student Loan Repayment program to be performed in a nursing home, in a hospice, in a home health agency, in a nurse-managed health center, or in a public health department, in addition to facilities where such service may currently be performed.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a National Nurse Corps Scholarship program to provide scholarships to individuals seeking nursing education in exchange for service from such individuals in critical nursing shortage areas or facilities upon completion of such education. Sets forth eligibility, application, payment, and reporting requirements. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007.

Requires the Secretary to award grants to schools of nursing and/or health care facilities to develop and support: (1) educational outreach programs to encourage entry into the profession, targeting primary, secondary, and other schools, the disadvantaged, underrepresented minorities, and underserved rural and urban communities; (2) career ladder programs; (3) gerontology curriculum and competencies and efforts to encourage long-term care nursing services for the elderly as a career choice; (4) nurse internship and residency programs; and (5) demonstrations of models and best practices in nursing care, including retention strategies. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007.

Requires the Secretary to develop and administer a comprehensive national multi-media public education campaign to encourage pursuit of the nursing profession. Includes grants for similar State campaigns. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007.

Requires the Secretary to award grants to area health education centers to develop models of excellence for nurses or expand existing school mentoring programs to include one for nurses. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007.

Establishes for advanced degree nursing students: (1) a fast-track nursing faculty loan program, providing loan forgiveness in exchange for teaching services; and (2) a scholarship and stipend program. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007.

Establishes a National Commission on the Recruitment and Retention of Nurses to make innovative and creative recommendations concerning recruitment, retention, and advancement. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007.