Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 12/20/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/23/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/07/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/27/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/12/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/16/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/20/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/21/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/22/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/06/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/11/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 06/18/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/23/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/30/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/01/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/01/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/03/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/09/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/18/2002