Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 02/07/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/08/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/11/2002
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/11/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 02/12/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/12/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/13/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/13/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/14/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/14/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/26/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/26/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/26/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/26/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/26/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/26/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/26/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/26/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/27/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/27/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/27/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/27/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/27/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/27/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/27/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/27/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/28/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/28/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 02/28/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/28/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/28/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/04/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/04/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/04/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/04/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/04/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/04/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/04/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/04/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/04/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/05/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/06/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/06/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/07/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/07/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/07/2002
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/07/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/13/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/13/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/19/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/19/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/08/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/08/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/15/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/22/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/30/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/15/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew