Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/07/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/07/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/08/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/11/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/13/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/15/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/15/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/15/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/19/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/10/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/12/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/12/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/12/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/02/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/21/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/03/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/25/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/25/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/01/2002