Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/14/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/14/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/14/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/27/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/10/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/26/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/30/2002