Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/21/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/21/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/09/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/09/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/09/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/09/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/09/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/09/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/11/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/11/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/15/2002
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/17/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/17/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/17/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/17/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/17/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/18/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/18/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/18/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/22/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/23/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/25/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/01/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/01/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/02/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/02/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/02/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/07/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/08/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/08/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/13/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/14/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/20/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/03/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/03/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/06/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/13/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/14/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/18/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/19/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/19/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/25/2002